Global patent index - EP 0906634 B1

EP 0906634 B1 2000-01-05 - CONTACT ARRANGEMENT FOR VACUUM SWITCH

Title (en)

CONTACT ARRANGEMENT FOR VACUUM SWITCH

Title (de)

KONTAKTANORDNUNG FÜR VAKUUMSCHALTER

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE CONTACT POUR INTERRUPTEUR A VIDE

Publication

EP 0906634 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97931617 A

Priority

  • DE 9701221 W
  • DE 19624920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19624920A1] Such contact arrangements usually consist of two opposite contact makers (1). In order to form a spiral contact, each contact maker (1) may have slots that extend outward from a centre. According to the invention, the contour of the slots (3-8) has a variable radius (r( phi )) whose foot coincides with the centre (10) of the contact maker (1) with a predetermined radius (RK). The slots preferably end at or slightly intersect a turned groove (2) with predetermined radius (RI) located at the centre of the contact maker (1), whereas RI SIMILAR 0.25 - 0.33 . RK. Specific mathematic functions may be given for the slot contours.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01H 33/664 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6643 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19624920 A1 19980102; EP 0906634 A1 19990407; EP 0906634 B1 20000105; JP H11513174 A 19991109; US 6140599 A 20001031; WO 9750105 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59700981

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990426

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR