Global Patent Index - EP 0906643 B1

EP 0906643 B1 2000-04-26 - ELECTROMECHANICAL CONNECTOR

Title (en)

ELECTROMECHANICAL CONNECTOR

Title (de)

ELEKTROMECHANISCHE VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ELECTROMECANIQUE

Publication

EP 0906643 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929250 A

Priority

  • DE 29610996 U
  • EP 9703262 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6966781B1] The electromechanical connector proposed has a switch and an actuator. The switch can be connected by means of contacts to a power supply and has switching magnets with encoded magnetic elements mounted on a carriage. It is fitted in a housing as an enclosed unit. The actuator has actuation magnets with encoded magnetic elements and can be connected to a consumer. The switch can be connected to the actuator, connecting these two devices causing the switching magnets to move, against a restraining force, from an inoperative position to an operating position. The electrical connection between the switch and the actuator is thus established by means of contacts. The ends of the switch and actuator facing each other are fitted with alignment devices designed so that electrical contact between the switch and the actuator can only be made when the contacts are in a particular position with respect to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/62; H01R 13/64; H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6205 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29610996 U1 19960912; AU 3342597 A 19980114; EP 0906643 A1 19990407; EP 0906643 B1 20000426; ES 2147675 T3 20000916; US 6966781 B1 20051122; WO 9750152 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160707

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147675

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. CORRADINI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701522

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990629

1999-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BULLINGER, ACHIM; C/O FRAU RUTH BULLINGER

1999-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FRITSCH, KLAUS-DIETER

1999-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NEIDLEIN, HERMANN

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990113

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT DE ES FR GB IT