Global Patent Index - EP 0906644 B1

EP 0906644 B1 2000-08-16 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR INCLUDING A MATING ASSURANCE DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR INCLUDING A MATING ASSURANCE DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER MIT KUPPLUNGSSICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE AVEC DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ASSURER L'ACCOUPLEMENT DE CONNECTEURS

Publication

EP 0906644 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97924187 A

Priority

  • GB 9612621 A
  • GB 9626613 A
  • IB 9700693 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749146A1] An electrical connector (12, 112) for mating with a complementary component (14, 114), the connector comprising: a connector housing (24) having cavities (30, 130) therein for receiving contacts; a positive contact retention member (26, 126) cooperating with the connector housing (24, 124) and having a first position where contacts are insertable into the cavities (30, 130) and a second position where the contacts are positively retained in the connector housing (24, 124): a deflectable latch (46, 146) that is complementary to a corresponding catch (122) on the complementary component (14, 114) for retaining the complementary component and connector in a mated position; and a mating assurance device (16, 116) having a preassembled position and an assurance position, during mating, the mating assurance device (16, 116) being displaceable from the preassembled position to the assurance position once complete mating and engagement of the complementary catch (122) by the deflectable latch arm (14, 114) occurs; the electrical connector (12, 112) being characterized in that for the mating assurance device (16, 116) to be displaced from the preassembled position to the assurance position, the positive contact retention member (26, 126) must be in the second position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/641 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4362 (2013.01); H01R 13/641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9749146 A1 19971224; AU 2974197 A 19980107; DE 69702852 D1 20000921; DE 69702852 T2 20010118; EP 0906644 A1 19990407; EP 0906644 B1 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050613

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050613

2004-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702852 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991029

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR INCLUDING A MATING ASSURANCE DEVICE

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981205

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT