Global Patent Index - EP 0906645 B1

EP 0906645 B1 2000-03-22 - Printed circuit board with socket and base for a small incandescent lamp

Title (en)

Printed circuit board with socket and base for a small incandescent lamp

Title (de)

Leiterplatine mit Fassung und Sockel für eine Kleinglühlampe

Title (fr)

Platine à circuit imprimé avec douille et culot pour petite lampe à incandence

Publication

EP 0906645 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925898 A

Priority

  • DE 9701121 W
  • DE 19624690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19624690A1] A socket and base for a small incandescent lamp enable the small incandescent lamp to be detachably mounted on a printed circuit board. The electric contacts (7) of the base (3) are designed as metallic sleeves and the socket has metallic contact pins (8) fixed to the printed circuit board (2). The metallic contact pins (8) may be detachably plugged into the base contacts (7) designed as metallic sleeves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/20; F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); H01R 12/55 (2011.01); H01R 33/06 (2006.01); H01R 33/20 (2006.01); F21Y 101/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19624690 A1 19980102; AT 191105 T 20000415; BR 9709849 A 19990810; CN 1096136 C 20021211; CN 1216640 A 19990512; EP 0906645 A2 19990407; EP 0906645 B1 20000322; ES 2144316 T3 20000601; HU 0103012 A2 20011228; HU 0103012 A3 20030630; JP 2001515644 A 20010918; KR 20000016776 A 20000325; TW 371811 B 19991011; WO 9749148 A2 19971224; WO 9749148 A3 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050604

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030605

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030604

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G. -FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-08-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020620

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020610

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020606

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020529

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144316 T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701323 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191105 T 20000415

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD WITH SOCKET AND BASE FOR A SMALL INCANDESCENT LAMP

1999-06-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CIRCUIT PLATE WITH SOCKET AND BASE FOR A SMALL INCANDESCENT LAMP

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE