Global Patent Index - EP 0906663 B1

EP 0906663 B1 2002-09-11 - SERIAL-PARALLEL AND PARALLEL-SERIAL CONVERTER

Title (en)

SERIAL-PARALLEL AND PARALLEL-SERIAL CONVERTER

Title (de)

SERIELL-PARALLEL- UND PARALLEL-SERIELL-UMSETZER

Title (fr)

CONVERTISSEUR SERIE-PARALLELE ET PARALLELE-SERIE

Publication

EP 0906663 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97928572 A

Priority

  • SE 9700980 W
  • SE 9602458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749186A1] The invention relates to fast serial-parallel and parallel-serial converters, and in them included frequency dividers. The serial-parallel converter comprises a shift register (51), an output register (52) and a frequency divider (40). The parallel-serial converter comprises a register (61) and a frequency divider (40). All registers (51, 52, 61) and frequency dividers comprise clock inputs (CK0-CK7), that each is connected to some incoming clocksignal (CLK). According to the invention, the frequency divider (40) comprises at least two circuits (0-7) with the function of AND-gates with clocked memory circuits. Each circuit comprises a clockinput (CK0-CK7), a first AND-input, a second AND-input (SE0-SE7), and at least one output (Q0-Q7) that outputs the value of the logical AND-function of the two AND-inputs (SDI0-SDI7, SE0-SE7). The first AND-inputs (SDI0-SDI7) are connected to each other and to an inverted signal from one of the outputs (Q7). The second AND-inputs (SE1-SE7) except on the first circuit (0) are connected to the output (Q0-Q6) of the preceding circuit (0-6). Finally a frequency divided clocksignal (CLKdiv) may be taken out from one of the outputs (Q4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03K 23/40; H03K 27/00; H03M 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03K 23/40 (2006.01); H03K 23/54 (2006.01); H03K 27/00 (2006.01); H03M 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03M 9/00 (2013.01); H03K 23/544 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9749186 A1 19971224; AU 3279897 A 19980107; CN 1228886 A 19990915; DE 69715409 D1 20021017; DE 69715409 T2 20030807; EP 0906663 A1 19990407; EP 0906663 B1 20020911; JP 2000516054 A 20001128; SE 506817 C2 19980216; SE 9602458 D0 19960620; SE 9602458 L 19971221; US 6169500 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715409

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715409

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130702

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715409 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981210

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB