Global Patent Index - EP 0906736 A3

EP 0906736 A3 2001-12-19 - Fitting for folding table

Title (en)

Fitting for folding table

Title (de)

Klapptischbeschlag

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour table pliante

Publication

EP 0906736 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117830 A

Priority

  • DE 19741743 A
  • US 18727198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741743A1] Attached to the lower side of the table top (3) is a U-shaped element (4) to which the leg (1) of the table (2) is pivotally joined to the rotation axis (5). When a leg (1) is unfolded, gravity causes a lock (6) to fall into place and keep the leg (1) in a vertical position. Stop (7) prevents the lock (6) from unwanted release. The folding mechanism can be hidden behind various synthetic covers (4), matching the color and/or style of the table (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 3/00; A47B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/00 (2006.01); A47B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/08 (2013.01); A47B 2003/0824 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741743 A1 19990325; DE 19741743 C2 20001116; DE 59808800 D1 20030731; EP 0906736 A2 19990407; EP 0906736 A3 20011219; EP 0906736 B1 20030625; ES 2196448 T3 20031216; US 5974982 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808800

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120921

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120921

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUSCH + CO. GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KUSCH + CO SITZMOEBELWERKE GMBH & CO KG, 59969 HALLENBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59808800

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808800

- Representative's name: SPARING - ROEHL - HENSELER, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090922

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090921

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196448 T3

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808800 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUSCH & CO. SITZMOEBELWERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020429

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 3/00 A, 7A 47B 3/08 B

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI