Global Patent Index - EP 0906747 A3

EP 0906747 A3 2001-03-14 - Device for a dosed dispensing of powder cleaning product in a cleaning machine using water

Title (en)

Device for a dosed dispensing of powder cleaning product in a cleaning machine using water

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum dosierten Zugeben eines pulverförmigen Reinigungsmittels in wasserführenden Reinigungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la distribution dosée d'un produit de nettoyage en poudre dans les machines à nettoyer utilisant de l'eau

Publication

EP 0906747 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116631 A

Priority

DE 19740819 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19740819A1] The chambers (9) have filling openings (13) for the filling of individual or all chambers (9) with detergent. The openings (9) are connected to the outlet opening (22) of a funnel-shaped detergent supply unit (9) and also form openings (13) for the washing water addition. These openings (13) can be controlled separately and correspond to the outlet openings (14). The chambers (9) have filling openings (13) for the filling of individual chambers (9) or all the chambers with detergent. The openings (9) are connected to the outlet opening (22) of a funnel-shaped detergent supply unit (9) and also form openings (13) for the washing water addition. These openings (13) can be controlled separately and correspond to the outlet openings (14) for the detergent powder enriched with water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/44; D06F 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4463 (2013.01); D06F 39/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19740819 A1 19990318; EP 0906747 A2 19990407; EP 0906747 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060307

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG & CO. KG

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI