Global Patent Index - EP 0906767 A3

EP 0906767 A3 2000-01-05 - Multiple site drug delivery system

Title (en)

Multiple site drug delivery system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verabreichung von Medikamenten auf verschiedene Stellen

Title (fr)

Système d'administration de médicament en plusieurs endroits du corps

Publication

EP 0906767 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306884 A

Priority

US 92191597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906767A2] An apparatus and method of delivering drugs from multiple sites on a patients body is provided. A controller is used at each site, and these controllers communicate with each other to coordinate drug delivery from the multiple sites. In a preferred embodiment, the drugs are delivered using iontophoresis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/168 (2006.01); A61M 31/00 (2006.01); A61N 1/30 (2006.01); A61N 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/0432 (2013.01); A61M 5/16827 (2013.01); A61M 31/002 (2013.01); A61N 1/30 (2013.01); A61N 1/325 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906767 A2 19990407; EP 0906767 A3 20000105; EP 0906767 B1 20050330; DE 69829533 D1 20050504; DE 69829533 T2 20060330; US 5899876 A 19990504

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080827

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080827

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071001

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829533 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VYTERIS, INC.

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI