Global Patent Index - EP 0906787 A3

EP 0906787 A3 2000-05-03 - Combined water inlet and bendback flag for wire edge guides of curtain coating apparatus

Title (en)

Combined water inlet and bendback flag for wire edge guides of curtain coating apparatus

Title (de)

Kombiniertes Wasserzulauf- und Krümmungs-Element für die Führungsdrähte einer Vorrichtung zur Vorhangbeschichtung

Title (fr)

Arrivée d'eau et élément d'inflexion combinés pour les fils de guidage latéraux d'un dipositif d'enduction par rideau

Publication

EP 0906787 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203158 A

Priority

US 6066897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906787A2] A water inlet body (12) for use with a curtain coating apparatus. The water inlet body (12) is integrally formed with a bendback flag (76) of predetermined width and following a predetermined generally curved path. The water inlet body (12) is adapted to be interchangeably mounted to the supporting strut which forms part of the curtain coating apparatus. This allows the water inlet body (12) to be easily changed depending on the specific coating solution and coating apparatus operating parameters. In such manner, not only can the bendback trajectory be closely matched for a variety of solutions and coating parameters but the width of the bendback (76) flag can be matched to the thickness of the coating solution thereby obviating the thinning problems created by the wider bendback flags. Exchange of water inlet bodies can be accomplished without disturbing the wire edge guides. There is a water conduit path through the water inlet body through which water is delivered to a channel in the surface of the water inlet body. The channel is angled toward the curtain-side surface of the water inlet body (12) from which the bend back flag projects. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/00; G03C 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906787 A2 19990407; EP 0906787 A3 20000503; EP 0906787 B1 20030108; DE 69810559 D1 20030213; DE 69810559 T2 20030814; JP H11165108 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050921

2006-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-08-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040812

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810559 P 20030213

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05C 5/00 A, 7G 03C 1/74 B

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI