Global Patent Index - EP 0906870 B1

EP 0906870 B1 2002-12-18 - Gripping device for one or more prismatic packages

Title (en)

Gripping device for one or more prismatic packages

Title (de)

Greifvorrichtung für einen oder mehrere prismatische Behälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de préhension pour un ou plusieurs conditionnements en forme de prisme droit

Publication

EP 0906870 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402300 A

Priority

FR 9712211 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906870A1] The holder is shaped to fit over the upper ends of square or rectangular-section drinks containers with tent-shaped tops and has flaps to engage with them. The holder is made from a semi-rigid sheet material such as card or corrugated cardboard, and is cut and folded so that it fits over the upper ends of the containers (2). It has side (10) and end (12) panels, and two flaps (11) which fit over the sloping surfaces of the container tops. The upper edges of the end or side panels, depending on the holder's configuration, have triangular flaps (14) which fold inside the tops of the containers to engage with them. The sloping flaps have holes (17) for the container caps (7) and cutout apertures (18) for gripping the holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906870 A1 19990407; EP 0906870 B1 20021218; DE 69810222 D1 20030130; DE 69810222 T2 20030724; ES 2186988 T3 20030516; FR 2769007 A1 19990402; FR 2769007 B1 19991224

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2011-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186988 T3

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810222 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810222 P 20030130

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

1999-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990929

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI