Global Patent Index - EP 0906964 A3

EP 0906964 A3 2002-09-18 - Thermal barrier coating and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Thermal barrier coating and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Wärmedämmschicht und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Couche formant une barrière thermique et procédé pour sa production

Publication

EP 0906964 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118456 A

Priority

DE 19743579 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906964A2] The method for producing a ceramic heat barrier layer by thermal spraying on a metal component whereby during and/or after application of such a layer it is subjected to a shot-blasting process. The resultant barrier layer has cracks near the surface produced by the shot-blasting process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/10; C23C 4/12; C23C 4/18; C04B 35/5831

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/28 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2016.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01); F01D 25/08 (2006.01); F02C 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/12 (2013.01); C23C 4/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906964 A2 19990407; EP 0906964 A3 20020918; EP 0906964 B1 20080102; DE 19743579 A1 19990415; DE 19743579 C2 20010816; ES 2297872 T3 20080501; JP 4603105 B2 20101222; JP H11158599 A 19990615; US 6214475 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-10-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141007

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2297872 T3

2008-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080103

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2008-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 23C 4/10 A, 7C 23C 4/12 B, 7C 23C 4/18 B, 7C 04B 35/5831 B

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI