Global patent index - EP 0906978 A3

EP 0906978 A3 2000-03-15 - Method and device for obtaining pure weft waste of catch selvedges

Title (en)

Method and device for obtaining pure weft waste of catch selvedges

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von sortenreinem Schussfadenabfall aus Fangleisten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour obtenir des déchets de fil de trame purs des lisières de retenue

Publication

EP 0906978 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114507 A

Priority

DE 19743612 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906978A2] The twist-woven (1a) strip (1) is cut (14) from the body of the woven fabric (2), and wound on, carrying away the weft thread ends (3). Twist threads involved, being breakage-resistant, are recirculated continuously, to make further twist-woven strip, maintaining the process. An Independent claim is included for equipment carrying out the process. It includes a control unit (9) and an edge twister (5) with reversible rotor (5a) for the twist fibers. A twist reverser and winder (6, 10) advance the twist strip (1a). The weft thread end extractor (8) intervenes. Pulleys return the continuous twist threads back to the start. Preferred features: Twist weave winding proceeds in synchronism with production, or alternatively, asynchronously. Weft fiber ends are sorted according to their material type, into separate collection bins. The twist threads are endless, and made of weldable material. Removal or collection of weft fiber ends is carried out under programmed process control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/00 (2006.01); D03D 47/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906978 A2 19990407; EP 0906978 A3 20000315; DE 19743612 A1 19990415; DE 19743612 C2 20010111; JP H11152654 A 19990608

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030208

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020809

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI