Global Patent Index - EP 0906979 A3

EP 0906979 A3 2000-02-23 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0906979 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115236 A

Priority

DE 19739135 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739135A1] The knitting includes a button-like stitched formation (12) used for fastening the garment. This is achieved by a local concentration of stitches in several successive rows of knitting. An Independent claim is included for knitting produced as described. Preferred features: Stitches for the button are formed on one needle bed; tuck stitches are formed on the opposite needles of the other needle bed. In the following two rows of knitting, further stitches and left and right tuck stitches are formed for left and right edges of the formation, which are not connected to the base knitting. Alternating rows of stitches and tuck stitches are formed until the button reaches the desired size. A row of stitches is formed on both beds. The left edge loop is locked onto a loop of the base knit. The last two steps are repeated for the right edge loop. A securing, knitted row is formed. A variant of the method is described. A loop is knitted; this forms the counterpart of the button fastening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0113 (2013.01); D10B 2403/02 (2013.01); D10B 2501/062 (2013.01); D10B 2501/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739135 A1 19990311; EP 0906979 A2 19990407; EP 0906979 A3 20000223; EP 0906979 B1 20040324; ES 2215256 T3 20041001; US 6301939 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050816

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215256 T3

2004-08-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES IT

2002-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000729

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES IT

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI