Global patent index - EP 0906982 A3

EP 0906982 A3 2000-01-12 - Embroidery/lace machine

Title (en)

Embroidery/lace machine

Title (de)

Stickmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à broder

Publication

EP 0906982 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308100 A

Priority

JP 27142597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906982A2] In the present invention, a shuttle type embroidery/lace machine includes a frontal thread storage means, a driven type-thread feeding means for feeding the frontal thread from the frontal thread storage means, a movable thread guide for advancing and retreating the frontal thread, a needle carrier for supporting the needles, a cloth frame, a shuttle, and a control unit for controlling said thread feeding means, said movable thread guide, said needle carrier, said cloth frame and said shuttle, characterized in that, said control unit controls said drive type thread feeding means so as to feed a portion of an amount of the frontal thread actually necessary for the embroidering, and said shuttle type embroidery/lace machine further includes means for allowing the remainder of the amount of the frontal thread actually necessary for the embroidering to be fed by pulling the remainder of the amount of the frontal thread out of said frontal thread storage means due to a tension applied to the frontal thread produced by an insufficient amount of the frontal thread actually necessary for embroidering, stitches being formed by pulling both said frontal thread and a dorsal thread of said shuttle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 45/00 (2006.01); D05C 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906982 A2 19990407; EP 0906982 A3 20000112; JP H11107156 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI