Global Patent Index - EP 0906998 A3

EP 0906998 A3 2001-01-31 - Face plate mounting arrangement

Title (en)

Face plate mounting arrangement

Title (de)

Stulpschienenbefestigung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d'une têtière

Publication

EP 0906998 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114860 A

Priority

DE 19740603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19740603A1] A pin (24) on the underside of the support body is in the form of an interlocking or frictionally sealed element (25) which enters a bore (26) in the base of the groove. The pin preferably makes a snap fastening with the bore and edges which fit behind the edges of the bore.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/22; E05B 17/00; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01); E05C 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/0004 (2013.01); E05C 9/24 (2013.01); E05C 9/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19740603 A1 19990318; DE 19740603 C2 20010308; AT 261046 T 20040315; EP 0906998 A2 19990407; EP 0906998 A3 20010131; EP 0906998 B1 20040303; PL 187941 B1 20041130; PL 328560 A1 19990329

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070807

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEGENIA-AUBI K.G.

- Effective date: 20040831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060807

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060807

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060807

2005-08-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEGENIA-AUBI K.G.

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2004-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810888 P 20040408

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05C 9/22 A, 7E 05C 9/00 B, 7E 05B 17/00 B

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI