Global Patent Index - EP 0906999 A3

EP 0906999 A3 2000-05-24 - Insulating web for composite profiles of window or door frames

Title (en)

Insulating web for composite profiles of window or door frames

Title (de)

Isoliersteg für Verbundprofile von Fenster- oder Türrahmen

Title (fr)

Ame isolante de profilés composites de cadres de fenêtre ou de porte

Publication

EP 0906999 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118737 A

Priority

  • DE 19743810 A
  • DE 19804222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906999A2] The heat insulating material has high porosity, at least in the region between its ends (2) which border against the composite profile section (6). The support section (1) is made of a high-strength material, e.g. polyamide, on and/or in which the regions of higher porosity material (3) are arranged. The support section is continuous between the ends. When installed, the support section of the insulating bridge between the profiles faces outwards. The increased porosity or volume increase is achieved by chemical and/or physical after-treatment, for example by spraying water on the still-soft plastic, or by use of chemical substances. The support section and region of higher porosity are co-extruded. The insulating bridging section has a transverse web (4) of a material of higher porosity. The porous material of the insulating bridging section and of the transverse web are the same and they are built in one piece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/2632 (2013.01); E06B 2003/2633 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26374 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906999 A2 19990407; EP 0906999 A3 20000524; EP 0906999 B1 20030604; EP 0906999 B2 20080528

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808595

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RAMER HARALD

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRAMER ALBERT

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101005

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101005

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101005

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECHNOFORM CAPRANO + BRUNNHOFER GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ENSINGER GMBH

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECHNOFORM CAPRANO + BRUNNHOFER GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808595 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI