Global Patent Index - EP 0907008 B1

EP 0907008 B1 2001-03-14 - Cylinder head with valve gear for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cylinder head with valve gear for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf mit Ventilsteuerung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culasse avec commande de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0907008 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115431 A

Priority

DE 19743488 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907008A1] The device incorporates a drag lever (3) and projections (11,11') for tool-free positioning of the lever on the valve shaft (9) and a gudgeon in the transverse direction of the lever, on the cylinder head (1). The projections are at a distance to the sides (10) of the lever. A stop rib in the longitudinal direction of the lever, connects the valve shaft-sided stop webs (6) of the lever, together with a further projection (13) on the cylinder head next to the gudgeon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907008 A1 19990407; EP 0907008 B1 20010314; DE 19743488 A1 19990408; ES 2156016 T3 20010601

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150801

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156016

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800529

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000630

1999-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI