Global Patent Index - EP 0907009 A3

EP 0907009 A3 2000-09-13 - Coolant and lubricant passage for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Coolant and lubricant passage for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kühl- und Schmiermittelführung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Passage pour agents de refroidissement et de lubrification pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0907009 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117618 A

Priority

DE 19743445 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907009A2] The cylinder head (3) and crankcase (2) have separate cooling water feed/drainage channels (6a, 6b) and oil intake/outlet bores (7a, 7b) axis-parallel to the crankshaft. Water/oil feed return are via a one-part distributor (5) flanged to the cylinder head and crankcase. Coolant flows from the water channels via cross channels to cooling faces in the cylinder head and back via return channels. Lubricant flows via distributor bores to the consumers, and back via collection bores.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/02; F01P 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 5/00 (2006.01); F01P 11/02 (2006.01); F01P 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/04 (2013.01); F01M 5/002 (2013.01); F01P 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907009 A2 19990407; EP 0907009 A3 20000913; EP 0907009 B1 20020724; DE 19743445 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59804863

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-04-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2011-03-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20110304

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804863

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-29

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: COOLANT AND LUBRICANT PASSAGE IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI