Global Patent Index - EP 0907103 B1

EP 0907103 B1 2000-08-09 - Process and apparatus for curtain coating a moving substrate

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for curtain coating a moving substrate

Title (de)

Verfahren und Apparatur zur Vorhangbeschichtung eines bewegten Trägers

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le revêtement par rideau d'un support en mouvement

Publication

EP 0907103 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810733 A

Priority

EP 97810733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907103A1] A device (10) is provided for sucking away the fluid film. Between the fluid inflow (9) and the curtain side a porous plate (2) is arranged. The porous plate extends over the complete height of the side guide and its thickness amounts to:- Hp(x) = 0.2 ((( rho 0 + rho gx) epsilon <3>) divided by ((dQf/dx)(1- epsilon )<2>S<2> mu )) where Hp = thickness of porous plate mu = viscosity of fluid flowing through porous medium epsilon = porosity of porous medium S = surface/volume of porous medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/74; B05C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/30 (2006.01); G03C 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/74 (2013.01); B05C 5/005 (2013.01); B05D 1/305 (2013.01); Y10S 118/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907103 A1 19990407; EP 0907103 B1 20000809; DE 59702151 D1 20000914; JP H11188299 A 19990713; US 6048582 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111003

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111004

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111003

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111003

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111003

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702151

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111003

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VESTINCPAT A.G.

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VESTINCOAT AG

2008-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VESTINCOAT AG

- Free text: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG#AAREWEG 6#4853 MURGENTHAL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- VESTINCOAT AG#AAREWEG 6#4853 MURGENTHAL (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG

2001-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG

2001-03-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG

2001-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG TRANSFER- TSE TRO

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702151 20000914

2000-09-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991112

1999-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990904

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE