Global Patent Index - EP 0907149 A3

EP 0907149 A3 2000-09-13 - Method for evaluating security prints

Title (en)

Method for evaluating security prints

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Auswertung von Sicherheitsabdrucken

Title (fr)

Méthode pour évaluer des impressions de sécurité

Publication

EP 0907149 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250403 A

Priority

  • DE 4221270 A
  • EP 93250183 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0576113A2] In this method, quantities are provided by a control device (6) of the franking machine before a print request, with a) generation of a combination number (KOZ1), b) encryption of the combination number (KOZ1) into a crypto-number (KRZ1) and c) conversion of the crypto-number (KRZ1) into at least one row of marking symbols (MSR1) by means of a set (SSY1) of symbols. An unmistakeable machine readable and manually analysable marking is assembled column by column with the remaining variable data already embedded in the frame data during the printing of the entire franking machine pattern. The symbols are selected from the aspect of good distinguishability and the associated possibility of interpreting the image content of the symbol in speech. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02; G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/0033 (2013.01); G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00032 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00354 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00443 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0054 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00588 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00604 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00645 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00709 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0576113 A2 19931229; EP 0576113 A3 19941207; EP 0576113 B1 20000308; CA 2099206 A1 19931227; CA 2099206 C 19981027; DE 4221270 A1 19940105; DE 59310377 D1 20051006; EP 0578042 A2 19940112; EP 0578042 A3 19941207; EP 0578042 B1 19990519; EP 0902400 A2 19990317; EP 0902400 A3 20000913; EP 0902400 B1 20050810; EP 0907149 A2 19990407; EP 0907149 A3 20000913; EP 0907150 A2 19990407; EP 0907150 A3 20000913; EP 0907150 B1 20050831; US 5471925 A 19951205; US 5894792 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100105

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040826

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 576113

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI