Global patent index - EP 0907151 A3

EP 0907151 A3 2000-01-05 - Device for reading and validating documents in general which are provided with magnetic bar codes and the like

Title (en)

Device for reading and validating documents in general which are provided with magnetic bar codes and the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Lesen und Überprüfen von Dokumenten im allgemeinen, die mit magnetischen Streifenkoden und dgl. versehen sind

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour lire et valider des documents en général, pourvus de codes barres magnétiques et similaires

Publication

EP 0907151 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118331 A

Priority

IT MI972247 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907151A2] A device for reading and validating documents in general which are provided with magnetic bar codes and the like, comprising a casing (2) which can be moved manually over a document to be validated and supports, in a lower part thereof, a magnetic reading head (10) flanked by a permanent magnet (12). The magnetic reading head (10) is operatively connected to a data processing unit (15) which is connected to a display accommodated in the casing (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/04 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/128 (2013.01); G07D 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907151 A2 19990407; EP 0907151 A3 20000105; IT 1295691 B1 19990524; IT MI972247 A1 19990402

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-02-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR READING AND VALIDATING DOCUMENTS IN GENERAL WHICH ARE PROVIDED WITH MAGNETIC BAR CODES

2003-01-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR READING AND VALIDATING DOCUMENTS IN GENERAL WHICH ARE PROVIDED WITH MAGNETIC BAR CODES

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011121

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI