Global Patent Index - EP 0907157 B1

EP 0907157 B1 2001-05-16 - Pull-through security seal

Title (en)

Pull-through security seal

Title (de)

Durchzieh-Sicherheitsplombe

Title (fr)

Plombage de sécurité à languette insérable

Publication

EP 0907157 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117225 A

Priority

EP 97117225 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907157A1] In the area of the transition between the basic body (1) or housing part (3) and the draw-back device (4) a groove as intended break point is so formed that when a tractive load is applied between the basic body and the tongue it breaks. The groove is arranged all-round the complete draw-back device. The opening of the groove faces the interior of the housing part. METALLURGY - The draw-back device is of metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 63/08 (2006.01); G09F 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/037 (2013.01); Y10T 24/153 (2013.01); Y10T 24/50 (2013.01); Y10T 292/48 (2015.04); Y10T 292/496 (2015.04); Y10T 292/50 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907157 A1 19990407; EP 0907157 B1 20010516; DE 59703554 D1 20010621; ES 2158421 T3 20010901; HU 0004597 A2 20010428; HU 0004597 A3 20010528; JP 2001519548 A 20011023; US 6328356 B1 20011211; WO 9918558 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051004

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051004

2005-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051004

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031006

2004-10-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041006

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031006

2002-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020906

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158421 T3

2001-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703554 20010621

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990811

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990313

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI