Global Patent Index - EP 0907192 A3

EP 0907192 A3 2000-03-08 - Tap changer

Title (en)

Tap changer

Title (de)

Stufenschalter

Title (fr)

Sélecteur de prises

Publication

EP 0907192 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116517 A

Priority

DE 19743864 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907192A2] The multiple-contact switch has several phases, each of which has a plate (5) with a number of fixed contacts (6) arranged in a circle. A movable selector contact carrier (7) is mounted on a central spindle. The plates are in parallel and the movable contact carriers are on the common spindle and this has a single actuator. Separate by pass contacts (11) are mounted in parallel with a movable contact on a shaft. The actuator uses a Geneva mechanism for indexing purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 21/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/40 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0038 (2013.01); H01H 9/0033 (2013.01); H01H 3/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907192 A2 19990407; EP 0907192 A3 20000308; EP 0907192 B1 20040128; AT 258713 T 20040215; CA 2249115 A1 19990404; CA 2249115 C 20061010; DE 19743864 C1 19990415; HK 1020501 A1 20040709; JP 4235290 B2 20090311; JP H11176296 A 19990702; US 6060669 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810652

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090805

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090907

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-09 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1020501

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810652 P 20040304

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 21/36 A

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI