Global Patent Index - EP 0907193 A3

EP 0907193 A3 2000-03-08 - Tap changer

Title (en)

Tap changer

Title (de)

Stufenschalter

Title (fr)

Sélecteur de prises

Publication

EP 0907193 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116519 A

Priority

DE 19743865 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907193A2] The multi-contact switch includes a by-pass switch that has a pair of movable contacts (2.1.2.2) mounted on a carrier (2). The carrier is indexed by a drive unit and the movable contacts selectively engage fixed contacts (3.1,3.2). The carrier is mechanically coupled to the drive spindle of a three phase stage switching arrangement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 29/04 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 31/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907193 A2 19990407; EP 0907193 A3 20000308; EP 0907193 B1 20040128; AT 258711 T 20040215; CA 2249520 A1 19990404; DE 19743865 C1 19990415; JP 4287924 B2 20090701; JP H11191514 A 19990713; US 6091032 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110902

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810653

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090805

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090907

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810653 P 20040304

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030206

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000129

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI