Global patent index - EP 0907223 A3

EP 0907223 A3 2001-02-07 - Self aligning electrical connector

Title (en)

Self aligning electrical connector

Title (de)

Sich selbst ausrichtendes elektrisches Verbindungsstück

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique à alignement automatique

Publication

EP 0907223 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98307992 A

Priority

US 94297097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907223A2] Several self aligning electrical connectors assemblies are disclosed. The assemblies include two halves which are connected together and in which at least one member is movable relative to the other during connection. Spring members bias the two members to a desired position to ensure the two members are held in a desired position after connection, and returned from any position of movement that may have occurred during the connection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/631

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/631 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6315 (2013.01); H01R 2201/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907223 A2 19990407; EP 0907223 A3 20010207

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEAR AUTOMOTIVE DEARBORN, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI