Global patent index - EP 0907249 A3

EP 0907249 A3 2000-08-16 - Piezoelectric component

Title (en)

Piezoelectric component

Title (de)

Piezoelektrisches Bauelement

Title (fr)

Composant piézoélectrique

Publication

EP 0907249 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118482 A

Priority

  • JP 28618097 A
  • JP 28767197 A
  • JP 24720398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0907249A2] A piezoelectric component 10 includes a substrate 12 on which a piezoelectric resonator 20 is mounted with supporting members 38 and 40 interposed therebetween. The substrate 12 is capped with a cap 46 so as to cover the piezoelectric resonator 20. A rubber-like elastic material 50 such as a silicone resin is injected through a hole 48 of the cap 48 to cover the periphery of the piezoelectric resonator 20. Preferably, the Young's modulus of the rubber-like elastic material 50 is not larger than 12 kgf/cm<2>. The cap of the piezoelectric component cannot come off easily. Further, The piezoelectric component is capable of accurate Qm adjustment and which can be reduced in size.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03H 9/17; H03H 9/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/10 (2006.01); H03H 9/58 (2006.01); H03H 9/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/178 (2013.01); H03H 9/1014 (2013.01); H03H 9/605 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0907249 A2 19990407; EP 0907249 A3 20000816; CN 1147995 C 20040428; CN 1213891 A 19990414; NO 313350 B1 20020916; NO 984575 A 19990406; NO 984575 D0 19980930; US 6114800 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060406

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050419

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR SE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: UNAMI, TOSHIHIKO

1999-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TAKESHIMA, TETSUO

1999-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: IRIE, MAKOTO, C/O (A170)INTEL. PROPERTY DPT.

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980930

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI