Global Patent Index - EP 0907409 B1

EP 0907409 B1 2001-12-12 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MIXING A SECOND MEDIUM WITH PULP

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MIXING A SECOND MEDIUM WITH PULP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN VON EINEM ZWEITEN MEDIUM MIT EINER PULPE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR MELANGER UN SECOND MILIEU A UNE PULPE

Publication

EP 0907409 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97924040 A

Priority

  • FI 9700325 W
  • FI 9600330 W
  • FI 965137 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746309A1] The present invention relates to a method and a device for mixing a second medium into a first medium. The method and the device according to the invention are particularly advantageous when used for mixing different chemicals, both liquid and gaseous, or steam into pulp suspension in the wood processing industry. In the method and device according to the invention, the first medium is fed into the mixer housing (10), mixed therein and removed from said housing (10), a freely rotatable rotor (20) being placed in said housing (10) and turned by means of the incoming medium flow into the housing (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/32 (2006.01); D21B 1/34 (2006.01); D21C 9/10 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/10 (2013.01); B01F 7/00908 (2013.01); B01F 7/32 (2013.01); D21B 1/342 (2013.01); B01F 15/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746309 A1 19971211; AT 210492 T 20011215; CA 2256594 A1 19971211; CA 2256594 C 20060926; DE 69709102 D1 20020124; DE 69709102 T2 20020718; EP 0907409 A1 19990414; EP 0907409 B1 20011212; FI 104621 B 20000315; FI 965137 A0 19961220; FI 965137 A 19971204

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100530

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100529

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100529

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709102 20020124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210492 T 20011215

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER PUMPEN AG

2000-10-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MIXING A SECOND MEDIUM WITH PULP

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981207

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE