Global patent index - EP 0907439 B1

EP 0907439 B1 2000-07-19 - CONTINUOUS CASTING INGOT MOULD FOR THE VERTICAL CASTING OF METALS

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS CASTING INGOT MOULD FOR THE VERTICAL CASTING OF METALS

Title (de)

VERTIKAL-STRANGGIESSKOKILLE MIT AUFSATZ

Title (fr)

LINGOTIERE DE COULEE CONTINUE POUR LA COULEE CONTINUE EN CHARGE VERTICALE DES METAUX

Publication

EP 0907439 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97919425 A

Priority

  • FR 9700547 W
  • FR 9604305 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2747062A1] The ingot mould of the invention includes a tubular metal member (4), of copper or copper alloy, cooled by water circulating against the outer wall thereof and causing the peripheral solidification of the cast metal as it contacts its inner wall. The mould also includes a non-cooled, heat-insulating refractory material feeder bush (9) for containing the liquid cast metal, extending above the cooled metal member (4) and defining therewith a continuous calibrating channel for the cast metal. A metal ring (16), cooled by an inner, horizontally circulating fluid, is inserted between said feeder bush (9) and the tubular member (4) and is aligned with the inner wall of said tubular member. The invention avoids deformations of the upper end of the cooled metal portion of the ingot mould.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0401 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2747062 A1 19971010; FR 2747062 B1 19980430; AT 194786 T 20000815; AU 2390897 A 19971029; BR 9708503 A 19990803; CA 2258109 A1 19971016; CA 2258109 C 20040713; DE 69702611 D1 20000824; DE 69702611 T2 20010308; DK 0907439 T3 20001113; EP 0907439 A1 19990414; EP 0907439 B1 20000719; ES 2150241 T3 20001116; GR 3034474 T3 20001229; JP 2000508242 A 20000704; JP 3727354 B2 20051214; KR 20000005253 A 20000125; PT 907439 E 20001229; US 6050324 A 20000418; WO 9737793 A1 19971016

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160301

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160304

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-30 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SOLLAC, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-30 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES CENTRUM VO, BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-30 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SOGEPASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-30 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SOCIETE ANONYME DES FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILL, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-30 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: UGITECH, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-30 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ASCO INDUSTRIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20141222

2007-04-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: UGITECH, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PD4A

- Effective date: 20070409

2007-03-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES CENTRUM VOOR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ASCOMETAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES CENTRUM VOOR R

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SOGEPASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SOCIETE ANONYME DES FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILLING

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SOLLAC

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: UGITECH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150241

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-10-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702611

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194786

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASCOMETAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOGEPASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOLLAC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES CENTRUM VOOR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE ANONYME DES FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILLING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990723

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981105

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE