Global Patent Index - EP 0907442 B1

EP 0907442 B1 2001-05-30 - PROCESS FOR OPTIMISING SURFACE QUALITY OF CONTINUOUS CASTINGS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR OPTIMISING SURFACE QUALITY OF CONTINUOUS CASTINGS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER STRANGOBERFLÄCHENQUALITÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR OPTIMISER LA QUALITE DE SURFACE DE PIECES MOULEES PAR COULEE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 0907442 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97922831 A

Priority

  • DE 9700732 W
  • DE 19614760 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19614760A1] The invention relates to a process in a casting mill for producing continuous castings, in particular continuously cast steel, in which the movement of the casting is determined and modified. The invention is characterised by the following process steps: (a) the melt surface is covered with a casting powder which forms a liquid slag to produce a lubricating film between the casting outer shell and the mould inner wall; (b) a measured value characterising the friction between the casting outer shell and mould inner wall is determined in the oscillation device and forwarded to the evaluation unit (in the form of a computer); (c) the signal which characterises the path-time behaviour of the casting is likewise forwarded to the computer; (d) the computer correlates and links the measured values or signals for the path-time behaviour of the casting and the friction of the casting in the mould to produce comparable values and compares them to a reference value; (e) the reference value is determined as a mean value of the casting speed from the path-time behaviour of the casting; (f) from the discrepancy between actual and reference values, a signal is generated to adjust the casting powder composition in order to reduce friction and/or mould vibration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/053 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/108 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/165 (2013.01); B22D 11/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19614760 A1 19971009; AT 201623 T 20010615; AU 2885797 A 19971022; AU 722408 B2 20000803; BR 9708495 A 19990803; CA 2250871 A1 19971009; CN 1072067 C 20011003; CN 1215357 A 19990428; EP 0907442 A1 19990414; EP 0907442 B1 20010530; ES 2157072 T3 20010801; JP 3130053 B2 20010131; JP H11513936 A 19991130; KR 20000005072 A 20000125; RU 2163856 C2 20010310; WO 9736706 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-02-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703679

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201623 T

- Effective date: 20120402

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-04-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020415

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-02 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157072 T3

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703679 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201623 T 20010615

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980909

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL