Global Patent Index - EP 0907552 B1

EP 0907552 B1 2002-09-18 - AUTONOMOUS CONTAINER SHIP

Title (en)

AUTONOMOUS CONTAINER SHIP

Title (de)

AUTONOMES CONTAINERSCHIFF

Title (fr)

NAVIRE PORTE-CONTENEURS AUTONOME

Publication

EP 0907552 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98922874 A

Priority

  • FR 9800840 W
  • FR 9705250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762578A1] The invention concerns an autonomous container ship comprising a hull, propulsion means, means for loading and unloading containers, balancing means, characterised in that it comprises means for transporting containers from important ports equipped with facilities for loading and unloading containers to small ports not provided with such equipment and less than 4 metres deep. Said means include propulsion means (4) ensuring the ship's cruising speed on the high seas and its speed in estuaries and ports, loading and unloading means (2, 6, 7, 8, 9) adapted to ports not provided with appropriate equipment, means for balancing the ship at sea providing stability and trim during container handling operations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 25/00; B63B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/12 (2006.01); B63B 25/00 (2006.01); B63B 27/00 (2006.01); B63B 43/06 (2006.01); B63B 43/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 43/14 (2013.01); B63B 25/004 (2013.01); B63B 43/06 (2013.01); B63B 2039/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762578 A1 19981030; FR 2762578 B1 19990604; AU 723398 B2 20000824; AU 7535998 A 19981124; CA 2259276 A1 19981105; CN 1119261 C 20030827; CN 1226864 A 19990825; DE 69808007 D1 20021024; DE 69808007 T2 20030605; DK 0907552 T3 20030127; EP 0907552 A1 19990414; EP 0907552 B1 20020918; ES 2183365 T3 20030316; JP 2000513675 A 20001017; KR 20000022366 A 20000425; NO 986148 A 19981228; NO 986148 D0 19981228; PL 330876 A1 19990607; PT 907552 E 20030131; RO 117441 B 20020329; TR 9802731 T1 19990721; US 2001018885 A1 20010906; US 6321673 B2 20011127; WO 9849052 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050428

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050428

2005-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050428

2005-04-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050427

2004-04-22 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040420

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040420

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-25 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183365 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404255

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021206

2003-01-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808007 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000707

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990118

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE