Global Patent Index - EP 0907573 B1

EP 0907573 B1 2000-08-30 - CLOSURE FOR PLASTIC TUBE

Title (en)

CLOSURE FOR PLASTIC TUBE

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS FÜR KUNSTSTOFFTUBE

Title (fr)

FERMETURE POUR TUBE EN PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 0907573 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97921839 A

Priority

  • DE 19617350 A
  • EP 9702223 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19617350A1] Plastic tubes are disclosed, in particular those with a locking mechanism which consists of a locking cam (110) and a locking recess (30) for ensuring a reliable engagement of the cap of the tube with the tube. Also disclosed are plastic tubes with a sealing strip (300) designed on the cap (100) of the tube and which according to the invention has certain preferred embodiments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/04; B65D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/44 (2006.01); B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/0471 (2013.01); B65D 41/3414 (2013.01); B65D 41/3447 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19617350 A1 19971106; BR 9710167 A 19990810; CA 2253303 A1 19971106; CN 1216964 A 19990519; EP 0907573 A2 19990414; EP 0907573 B1 20000830; JP H11509815 A 19990831; PL 329642 A1 19990412; US 6223919 B1 20010501; WO 9741041 A2 19971106; WO 9741041 A3 19980115

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702287 20001005

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981123

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT