Global patent index - EP 0907587 B1

EP 0907587 B1 2000-01-12 - WALL OR CASING MADE OF METAL SHEETS STRETCHED OVER A FRAME OR STRUCTURE, AND CONSTRUCTION PROCEDURE

Title (en)

WALL OR CASING MADE OF METAL SHEETS STRETCHED OVER A FRAME OR STRUCTURE, AND CONSTRUCTION PROCEDURE

Title (de)

WAND ODER HÜLLE AUS BLECHSTREIFEN WELCHE AUF EINEM RAHMEN ODER FACHWERK GESPANNT SIND UND IHRE AUFBAUVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PAROI OU ENVELOPPE FORMEE DE FEUILLES DE TOLE TENDUES SUR UNE OSSATURE OU UNE CHARPENTE ET SON PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION

Publication

EP 0907587 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97918241 A

Priority

  • FR 9700684 W
  • FR 9605058 A
  • FR 9611167 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9738921A1] The wall or casing is formed from several sheets of metal (5, 6) juxtaposed lengthwise (9, 10) and resting on longitudinal (2, 3) and transversal (4) sections. The longitudinal edges of the metal sheets are shaped as receptacles (13, 14) on which transversal mobile sliding pieces exert pressure, keeping one of the edges (9) pressed against the other (10) and creating laterally rigidifying pressure. The procedure involves the construction of any single wall or space by the attachment of metal sheets (5, 6) by their longitudinal edges (9, 10) to longitudinal sections using opposing transversal thrust exerted locally and at intervals over the entire length of the two adjacent metal sheets (5, 6). This invention concerns the field of metallic construction of walls or closed spaces for use in storage, for example.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/08; B65D 88/10; E04H 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/10 (2006.01); B65D 90/08 (2006.01); E04H 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 7/30 (2013.01); B65D 88/10 (2013.01); B65D 90/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9738921 A1 19971023; AU 2644097 A 19971107; AU 716713 B2 20000302; CA 2252007 A1 19971023; DE 69701145 D1 20000217; DE 69701145 T2 20000921; EP 0907587 A1 19990414; EP 0907587 B1 20000112; ES 2142673 T3 20000416; NO 984855 A 19981026; NO 984855 D0 19981016; PL 329384 A1 19990329; US 5996306 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-12-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010416

2001-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. RIONDE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-05-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010416

2001-04-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010416

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000515

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-04-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000422

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142673

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000410

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000407

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701145

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB LI LU NL

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981105

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB LI LU NL