Global Patent Index - EP 0907661 A4

EP 0907661 A4 2000-07-26 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR INHIBITION OF alpha v beta 5 MEDIATED ANGIOGENESIS

Title (en)

METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR INHIBITION OF alpha v beta 5 MEDIATED ANGIOGENESIS

Title (de)

METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DIE HEMMUNG VON ALPHA-V-BETA5 VERMITTELTER ANGIOGENESE.

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS SERVANT A L'INHIBITION DE L'ANGIOGENESE LIEE A LA PRESENCE DE alpha v beta 5

Publication

EP 0907661 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97927814 A

Priority

  • US 9709099 W
  • US 1873396 P
  • US 1586996 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745137A1] The present invention describes methods for inhibition of angiogenesis in tissues using vitronectin alpha v beta 3 antagonists, and particularly for inhibiting angiogenesis in inflamed tissues and in tumor tissues and metastases using therapeutic compositions containing alpha v beta 3 antagonists.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/435; C07K 14/705; C07K 14/78; C07K 16/28; A61K 38/16; A61K 38/39; A61K 39/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/04 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 279/14 (2006.01); C07C 311/06 (2006.01); C07C 311/10 (2006.01); C07D 263/38 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/75 (2006.01); C07K 14/78 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6491 (2013.01); A61K 38/04 (2013.01); A61K 38/16 (2013.01); A61K 38/4886 (2013.01); C07C 279/14 (2013.01); C07C 311/06 (2013.01); C07C 311/10 (2013.01); C07D 263/38 (2013.01); C07K 14/75 (2013.01); C07K 16/2839 (2013.01); C07K 16/2848 (2013.01); C07C 2602/42 (2017.05)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9528426 A2 19951026 - JOLLA CANCER RES FOUND [US]
  • [PX] WO 9714716 A1 19970424 - MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al
  • [PX] EP 0770622 A2 19970502 - MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]
  • [X] H P HAMMES ET AL.: "Subcutaneous injection of a cyclic peptide antagonist of vitronectin receptor-type integrins inhibits retinal neovascularization", NATURE MEDICINE., vol. 2, no. 5, May 1996 (1996-05-01), NATURE PUBLISHING, CO., US, pages 529 - 533, XP002138522, ISSN: 1078-8956
  • [X] P C BROOKS ET AL.: "Integrin alphaV beta3 antagonists promote tumor regression by inducing apoptosis of angiogenic blood vessels", CELL, vol. 79, 30 December 1994 (1994-12-30), NA US, pages 1157 - 1164, XP002138523
  • [X] P C BROOKS ET AL.: "Requirement of vascular integrin alphaV beta3 for angiogenesis", SCIENCE., vol. 264, 22 April 1994 (1994-04-22), AAAS. LANCASTER, PA., US, pages 569 - 571, XP002138524
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 125, no. 1, 1 July 1996, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 7248, R A CLARK ET AL.: "Transient functional expression of alpha.v.beta.3 on vascular cells during wound repair" XP002138525 & AM. J. PATHOL., vol. 148, no. 5, May 1996 (1996-05-01), pages 1407 - 1421AM. J. PATHOL.199605148514071421
  • See also references of WO 9745447A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745137 A1 19971204; WO 9745137 A8 20010201; AT 470450 T 20100615; BR 9709514 A 19990810; CA 2256543 A1 19971204; CA 2256543 C 20101207; CA 2256588 A1 19971204; CN 1226254 A 19990818; CZ 9803800 A3 19990512; CZ 9803834 A3 19990512; DE 69739907 D1 20100722; DK 0951295 T3 20100913; EP 0907661 A1 19990414; EP 0907661 A4 20000726; EP 0951295 A1 19991027; EP 0951295 A4 20000726; EP 0951295 B1 20100609; HU 9901628 A2 19990830; HU 9901628 A3 20021128; HU 9902099 A2 19990928; HU 9902099 A3 20011029; JP 2002515036 A 20020521; KR 20000016301 A 20000325; KR 20000016302 A 20000325; NO 985574 A 19990201; NO 985574 D0 19981127; NO 985575 A 19990201; NO 985575 D0 19981127; PL 330240 A1 19990510; PL 330241 A1 19990510; WO 9745447 A1 19971204

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1019451

2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2000-07-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981119

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 981117;LT PAYMENT 981117;LV PAYMENT 981117;RO PAYMENT 981117;SI PAYMENT 981117