Global Patent Index - EP 0907766 B1

EP 0907766 B1 2001-05-30 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A SCREEN BY ELECTROLYSIS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A SCREEN BY ELECTROLYSIS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN HERSTELLUNG EINES SIEBES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN TAMIS PAR ELECTROLYSE

Publication

EP 0907766 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928202 A

Priority

  • DE 19623724 A
  • EP 9703103 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19623724C1] The invention relates to a process for production of a screen by electrolysis. During said process, metal from an electrolyte is deposited on electrically conductive deposit surfaces (2) of a matrix (1) in the electrolyte in such a manner that a screen with screen members (5, 6, 7) and screen openings (8, 9) is formed. The invention firstly proposes to increase the viscosity of the electrolyte to at least 50 mPas; secondly to add a protective agent (11) modified by ions to the electrolyte, said protective agent (11) being removed during deposition from each outer side (12) of the screen members (5, 6, 7) which form; thirdly to eliminate the second procedural step; and fourthly to introduce an electrically insulating protective substance (13) into the screen openings (8, 9) which form when the matrix (1) is in the electrolyte, and so that the protective substance (13) does not deposit on the outer sides (12) of the screen members (5, 6, 7) which form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 1/08; C25D 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19623724 C1 19971218; AT 201725 T 20010615; AU 3258797 A 19980107; EP 0907766 A1 19990414; EP 0907766 B1 20010530; WO 9747788 A1 19971218

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703680 20010705

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201725 T 20010615

2000-11-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A SCREEN BY ELECTROLYSIS

2000-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A SCREEN BY ELECTROLYSIS

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981215

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL