Global Patent Index - EP 0907805 B1

EP 0907805 B1 2001-01-31 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR MONITORING THE WORKING RANGE WHEN AN ITEM OF MACHINERY IS MOVING

Title (en)

METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR MONITORING THE WORKING RANGE WHEN AN ITEM OF MACHINERY IS MOVING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES ARBEITSBEREICHES BEIM BEWEGEN EINES FORTBEWEGBAREN ARBEITSGERÄTES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA ZONE DE TRAVAIL LORS DU DEPLACEMENT D'UN ENGIN DE TRAVAUX

Publication

EP 0907805 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97921629 A

Priority

  • DE 9700847 W
  • DE 19622261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746767A1] The invention describes a method and arrangement with which the working ranges (AZU) of excavators, other earth-moving machinery, and agricultural machines can be monitored. For this purpose, individual parts of the machines are described by volume models (V10-V70), and aerials (A1, A2) for a global positioning system are provided on the machine itself (AG). In a control system of the machine, the exact spatial location of attachments (AT) on the machine is determined by means of their motion data and current position data, which are determined by sensors, for example. This exact spatial location is compared with a working range (AZU) that has been entered previously, for example by a "teach-in" method, or by CAD data. If the machine or one of its attachments (AT) threatens to leave the working range (AZU), the movement is either stopped, slowed, or an alarm is sounded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/24; B66C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/43 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/437 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746767 A1 19971211; EP 0907805 A1 19990414; EP 0907805 B1 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090424

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702977 20010308

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990423

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981123

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB