Global Patent Index - EP 0907808 B1

EP 0907808 B1 2003-06-04 - A WATERPROOFING MEMBRANE FOR ROOFING

Title (en)

A WATERPROOFING MEMBRANE FOR ROOFING

Title (de)

ABDICHTUNGSMEMBRAN FÜR DÄCHER

Title (fr)

MEMBRANE D'ETANCHEITE POUR TOITURE

Publication

EP 0907808 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97928594 A

Priority

  • SE 9701062 W
  • SE 9602520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749878A1] The invention refers to a waterproofing membrane for roofing comprising at least one water and moisture impervious first sub-layer of bitumen or like material and a second sub-layer which is applied over the first sub-layer. The second sub-layer is comprised of granules of plastic and/or elastomeric material being bonded to the first sub-layer, wherein the waterproofing membrane by means of said granule layer has an essentially fully maintenance-free and environmentally-friendly non-dusting surface structure like a conventional slate-crush bitumen surface. The granules are preferably ground fractions having a flaky form. The granule length is at most 4 mm and preferably within an interval of 0.15-2 mm. The granules may be comprised of integrated recovered plastic and/or elastomeric materials, for example recovered from rejected automotive tires.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DK FI GB IE NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9749878 A1 19971231; AT 242380 T 20030615; DK 0907808 T3 20030901; EP 0907808 A1 19990414; EP 0907808 B1 20030604; SE 506334 C2 19971201; SE 9602520 D0 19960626; SE 9602520 L 19971201

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040617

2005-01-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRELLEBORG BUILDING SYSTEMS A.B.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-08-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DK FI GB IE NL SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020709

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990126

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DK FI GB IE NL SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 990114;LV PAYMENT 990114