Global Patent Index - EP 0907809 B1

EP 0907809 B1 2000-08-30 - ROOFING DEVICE FOR MODULATING AND DISTRIBUTING SUNLIGHT

Title (en)

ROOFING DEVICE FOR MODULATING AND DISTRIBUTING SUNLIGHT

Title (de)

DACHVORRICHTUNG ZUR MODULIERUNG UND VERTEILUNG VON SONNENLICHTBESCHEINUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TOITURE PERMETTANT LA MODULATION ET LA REPARTITION DE L'ENSOLEILLEMENT

Publication

EP 0907809 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97918212 A

Priority

  • FR 9700652 W
  • FR 9605056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9739208A1] The invention concerns a device that creates a semi-shaded surface whose level of exposure to sunlight can be determined and on which the sunlight can be distributed uniformly for a given period. It consists of a fixed framework (1) supporting a mobile reciprocating frame (2). A skylight (A) with slats is set into the mobile frame (2). The mobile frame (2) supports one of several frames (3) into which are set skylights (B) with slats. The adjustable deviation between the frames (2 and 3) determines the level of exposure to sunlight. This device is especially intended for persons who wish to be exposed to a reasonable level of sunlight. Its field of application is particularly, though not exclusively, in the tourism, leisure and accommodation industries.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/03; E06B 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/16 (2006.01); E04D 13/03 (2006.01); E06B 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/166 (2013.01); E04D 13/033 (2013.01); E06B 9/24 (2013.01); Y10S 52/17 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT MC PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9739208 A1 19971023; AU 2641997 A 19971107; EP 0907809 A1 19990414; EP 0907809 B1 20000830; ES 2152663 T3 20010201; FR 2747707 A1 19971024; FR 2747707 B1 19990409; GR 3034912 T3 20010228; PT 907809 E 20010228; US 6148571 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101014

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090406

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2007-03-20 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20070320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Free text: FRANCOIS SEYLLER FR

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152663 T3

2000-11-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT MC PT

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-06-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19981006

1999-05-06 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

1999-04-28 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19990126

1999-04-21 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990126

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT MC PT