Global Patent Index - EP 0907812 B1

EP 0907812 B1 2000-01-19 - SECURING DEVICE FOR A SUPPORTING BAR

Title (en)

SECURING DEVICE FOR A SUPPORTING BAR

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES AUFLAGERIEGELS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE BARRE D'APPUI

Publication

EP 0907812 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928206 A

Priority

  • DE 19625545 A
  • EP 9703111 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625545A1] The present invention relates to a securing device shown in the figure or a supporting bar consisting of a tube (6) with such a securing device at each end. It is possible with the device of the invention to secure horizontal and vertical frame components together. The securing device consists of a supporting head (1) and a clamping device (3) and is designed in such a way that its upper edge (7) is on a plane with the tube (6) secured thereto. In addition, the securing device has bolts (12) for a positive connection with coverings (14) suspendable thereover. These structural features of the securing device make it possible to fit coverings with holes or eyes pushed over the bolts of the supporting bar for suspension in the frame as far as the uprights so that there is virtually no gap between the covering and the upright. In addition, the lengths of the supporting bars may be such that, owing to the identically adjustable axial spacing of the pairs of uprights of a modular frame to the axial distance of a frame structure, frame and modular frames may be combined with each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/15; E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/15 (2006.01); E04G 7/30 (2006.01); E04G 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/15 (2013.01); E04G 7/307 (2013.01); E04G 7/32 (2013.01); E04G 2001/158 (2013.01); Y10T 403/30 (2013.01); Y10T 403/4645 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625545 A1 19980102; AT 189029 T 20000215; AU 3258997 A 19980114; CA 2268946 A1 19971231; CZ 9804179 A3 19990616; EP 0907812 A1 19990414; EP 0907812 B1 20000119; PL 183358 B1 20020628; PL 330918 A1 19990607; US 6045287 A 20000404; WO 9749880 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PLETTAC A.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2002-06-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020620

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701052 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189029 T 20000215

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990520

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981228

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE