Global Patent Index - EP 0907818 B1

EP 0907818 B1 2001-01-03 - LIMITED-OPENING DOOR HINGE

Title (en)

LIMITED-OPENING DOOR HINGE

Title (de)

SCHARNIER FÜR TÜREN MIT SCHWENKHEMMUNG

Title (fr)

CHARNIERE DE PORTE A LIMITATION DE PIVOTEMENT

Publication

EP 0907818 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97927057 A

Priority

  • DE 19625557 A
  • EP 9702753 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625557A1] The invention relates to a hinge having an opening limiter in the form of matching curved wedge sections (8, 9) on the hinge pins (4) and on the hinge plates (2) pivoting about said hinge pins and in which the mutual angular position of said sections determines the limiting action. In order to ensure easy adjustment and the reliable securing of the hinge pin (4) in the hinge plate (3) in such a hinge, the seating surfaces of the hinge pin and the hinge plate supporting it have matching contours. A wedge shape (12, 13) or teeth are proposed for said contours.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/08; E05D 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 11/08 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/084 (2013.01); E05D 5/121 (2013.01); E05D 7/1044 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625557 A1 19980108; BR 9709985 A 19990810; EP 0907818 A1 19990414; EP 0907818 B1 20010103; ES 2155254 T3 20010501; JP 2000515937 A 20001128; KR 100382603 B1 20030716; KR 20000022161 A 20000425; WO 9749883 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090528

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155254 T3

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702859 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990514

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981208

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT