Global Patent Index - EP 0907874 B1

EP 0907874 B1 2000-10-04 - MEANS FOR INCREASING THE DRAG ON A MUNITION

Title (en)

MEANS FOR INCREASING THE DRAG ON A MUNITION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES LUFTWIDERSTANDES EINES GESCHOSSES

Title (fr)

MOYEN SERVANT A AUGMENTER LA TRAINEE D'UN PROJECTILE

Publication

EP 0907874 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97928379 A

Priority

  • GB 9701732 W
  • GB 9614133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801719A1] A means for increasing the drag of a munition to effect a course correction having coplanar interlocking pairs of drag plates (24, 26) being laterally extendable from an undeployed configuration, substantially contained within the munition, to a deployed configuration. The drag plates (101, 103) are provided with projections (34, 38) and slots (36, 40), the projections (34, 38) of one of a pair of drag plates being adapted to locate in the slots (34, 40) of the other drag plate in the undeployed configuration and being adapted such that they extend beyond halfway into the munition. A deployment means (60, 62, 70, 72) retains the drag plates in the undeployed configuration until receipt of a control signal and then effects deployment of the drag plates, the distance travelled between the deployed and undeployed configurations being determined by the extent of the projections (34, 38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801719 A1 19980115; AU 3269797 A 19980202; CA 2258544 A1 19980115; EP 0907874 A1 19990414; EP 0907874 B1 20001004; GB 9614133 D0 19970312; ZA 9705901 B 19980202

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-05-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: QINETIQ LIMITED

2001-03-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIDFORD, RUFUS,WILLIAM, INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY DEPT

2000-06-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-05-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): GB

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991027

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981208

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB