Global Patent Index - EP 0907945 B1

EP 0907945 B1 2002-09-04 - METHOD FOR ACTIVATING THE CELLS OF AN IMAGE DISPLAYING SCREEN, AND IMAGE DISPLAYING DEVICE USING SAME

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ACTIVATING THE CELLS OF AN IMAGE DISPLAYING SCREEN, AND IMAGE DISPLAYING DEVICE USING SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AKTIVIEREN VON BILDSCHIRMZELLEN UND ANZEIGEGERÄT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ACTIVATION DES CELLULES D'UN ECRAN DE VISUALISATION D'IMAGE, ET DISPOSITIF DE VISUALISATION D'IMAGE METTANT EN OEUVRE LE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0907945 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97930576 A

Priority

  • FR 9701123 W
  • FR 9608079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2750525A1] The invention concerns a method for activating the cells (C1 to C16) of an image displaying screen, (1), enabling the production of electric potential signals called "activation signals" (SE) to activate the cells, and to supply the current (ID) consumed by this activation. The method consists in applying to a solenoid (L) at least an electric potential (V2) so as to develop at the solenoid (L) terminals the activation signals (SE) and to cause to increase and to decrease in the solenoid (L) a main current (IL), which as it decreases serves to constitute the current (ID) consumed by cell activation. Thus cell activation control of the "current supplying" type is effected, particularly suited for the delivery of large amounts of current in a short time. The invention is applicable to image displaying screens such as plasma panels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/296 (2013.01); G09G 3/297 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/296 (2013.01); G09G 3/297 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2750525 A1 19980102; FR 2750525 B1 19980918; DE 69715202 D1 20021010; DE 69715202 T2 20030807; EP 0907945 A1 19990414; EP 0907945 B1 20020904; JP 2000513459 A 20001010; US 6400343 B1 20020604; WO 9800826 A1 19980108

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060624

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060624

2005-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715202 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990908

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981202

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB