Global Patent Index - EP 0907946 B1

EP 0907946 B1 2001-04-11 - DISPLAY SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR SUPPLYING A DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH A PICTURE SIGNAL

Title (en)

DISPLAY SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR SUPPLYING A DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH A PICTURE SIGNAL

Title (de)

ANZEIGESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSORGUNG EINES ANZEIGESYSTEMS MIT EINEM BILDSIGNAL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR UN SIGNAL-IMAGE A UN SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE

Publication

EP 0907946 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97926993 A

Priority

  • DE 9701163 W
  • DE 19625898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625898A1] The invention relates to a display system and a process for supplying a display system with a picture signal. The picture signal is delivered in relation to the system timer of the display system, thereby producing an improvement in the picture quality. Particularly good picture quality is produced when the change from the picture signal for one pixel to the picture signal for the following pixel is selected to be time-delayed at the scanning point at which the display system scans the picture signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/36 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/22 (2006.01); G09G 3/32 (2006.01); G09G 5/12 (2006.01); G09G 5/395 (2006.01); H04N 5/04 (2006.01); H04N 5/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/395 (2013.01); G09G 5/12 (2013.01); G09G 2340/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625898 A1 19980108; EP 0907946 A1 19990414; EP 0907946 B1 20010411; JP 2000500885 A 20000125; JP 3902665 B2 20070411; KR 20000022121 A 20000425; US 6380989 B1 20020430; WO 9800830 A1 19980108

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090609

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703359 20010517

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000911

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981217

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL