Global Patent Index - EP 0907988 B1

EP 0907988 B1 2000-04-19 - PLUG CONNECTOR SLEEVE

Title (en)

PLUG CONNECTOR SLEEVE

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDERHÜLSE

Title (fr)

DOUILLE DE CONNECTEUR A FICHES

Publication

EP 0907988 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929188 A

Priority

  • DE 19624086 A
  • DE 19624088 A
  • EP 9703117 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6068526A] PCT No. PCT/EP97/03117 Sec. 371 Date Dec. 9, 1998 Sec. 102(e) Date Dec. 9, 1998 PCT Filed Jun. 16, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO97/49145 PCT Pub. Date Dec. 24, 1997This invention relates to a connector bushing (1) comprising a plug-in zone (2) and a cable connection zone (3), the plug-in zone (2) being formed as a bushing (4) with a base (5), two side walls (7a, 7b) bent from the base (5), and first and second roof halves (8a, 8b) which start from the side walls and have free ends (9a, 9b) which are bent over towards the interior of the bushing. The connector bushing (1) comprises a central base zone (20) following the plug-in zone (2), being formed in the shape of a box with a base part in extension of the base of the plug-in zone with side walls in extension of the side walls of the plug-in zone and with a roof zone which is formed by third and fourth roof halves (18, 19) which are formed by bending over the side walls of the central base zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115; H01R 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/18 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01R 13/11 (2013.01); H01R 4/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6068526 A 20000530; AT 191994 T 20000515; BR 9709910 A 19990810; CA 2257988 A1 19971224; CA 2257988 C 20030902; EP 0907988 A1 19990414; EP 0907988 B1 20000419; ES 2144869 T3 20000616; JP 2000515301 A 20001114; WO 9749145 A1 19971224

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080628

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060617

2006-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-06-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-06-22 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2001-05-04 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144869 T3

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR IT SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191994 T 20000515

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990107

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR IT SE