Global Patent Index - EP 0908075 A4

EP 0908075 A4 2000-05-03 - METHOD AND HOT MELT MIX APPLICATOR WITH HEATED HOSE AND APPLICATOR WAND

Title (en)

METHOD AND HOT MELT MIX APPLICATOR WITH HEATED HOSE AND APPLICATOR WAND

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND AUFTRAGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR HEISSCHMELZGEMISCH MIT BEHEIZTEM ROHR UND AUFTRAGESTAB

Title (fr)

METHODE ET APPLICATEUR DE MELANGE THERMOFUSIBLE COMPORTANT UN TUYAU CHAUFFANT ET UN TUBE DISTRIBUTEUR

Publication

EP 0908075 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97932545 A

Priority

  • US 9711894 W
  • US 67033296 A
  • US 87717097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9750278A1] A heating system for a hot melt mix applicator hose (22) and dispenser wand (24) comprises a three phase heating element (30) powered by a generator (166) that is a vehicle alternator (194) driven by an internal combustion engine (52) to heat the hose (22), wand (24), and hot mix material within. A controller (46) communicates with a temperature sensor (122) carried by the hose (22) to selectively energize the generator (166) to provide current to the heating element (30) to maintain the desired hot mix material temperature. The heating element comprises three phase heating element wiring (98, 100, 102) wrapped around the hose (22) and wand (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/00; B05C 11/10; B67D 5/00; E01C 19/00; E01C 19/08; E04D 15/07; H05B 3/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/08 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01); B28C 1/22 (2006.01); E01C 19/45 (2006.01); H05B 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/45 (2013.01); B05C 11/1042 (2013.01); H05B 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9750278 A1 19971231; AT 275318 T 20040915; BR 9710454 A 19990817; CA 2258612 A1 19971231; CA 2258612 C 20040921; DE 69730500 D1 20041007; DE 69730500 T2 20050120; EP 0908075 A2 19990414; EP 0908075 A4 20000503; EP 0908075 B1 20040901; ES 2227706 T3 20050401; RU 2163651 C2 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090617

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060617

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227706 T3

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730500 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030417

2000-05-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/00 A, 7B 67D 5/00 B, 7E 01C 19/00 B, 7B 05C 11/10 B, 7E 04D 15/07 B, 7E 01C 19/08 B, 7H 05B 3/58 B

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981218

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT