Global Patent Index - EP 0908113 A3

EP 0908113 A3 2001-02-21 - Case , in particular for playing cards

Title (en)

Case , in particular for playing cards

Title (de)

Etui, insbesondere für Spielkarten

Title (fr)

Etui , en particulier pour cartes à jouer

Publication

EP 0908113 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118785 A

Priority

DE 29718092 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908113A2] Case, especially useful for playing cards, comprises two flat, essentially rectangular shells (10, 17), which meet together at the edges (18), to slide one into the other. The shell(s) (10, 17) has an elastically-deformable edge. One has catch projections (21), and the other (10) has mating, catch openings (15). Preferably the shells are made of an elastically-deformable material, e.g. polypropylene, polystyrene or 'Styrolux' (RTM). Used for playing cards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/00; A45C 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/24 (2006.01); A45C 13/10 (2006.01); A63F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/06 (2013.01); A45C 11/24 (2013.01); A45C 13/1076 (2013.01); A63F 1/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718092 U1 19971120; EP 0908113 A2 19990414; EP 0908113 A3 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI