Global Patent Index - EP 0908163 A3

EP 0908163 A3 2000-04-05 - Multi-position recliner chair

Title (en)

Multi-position recliner chair

Title (de)

Mehrfach verstellbarer Lehnstuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil inclinable multi-positions

Publication

EP 0908163 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308023 A

Priority

US 94417297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908163A2] An attended chair may include a recline or tilt arrangement by which gas cylinders (54,56) disposed beneath the seat (10) allow the seat back (12) to recline relative to the seat (10) or permit the seat back (12) and seat (10) to tilt as a unit relative to the frame (14). The chair has a simplified construction including a generally U-shaped, open center rigid frame spanned by a series of straps. In one version of the chair, the straps may be individually adjusted for comfort of the user. Additionally, an open-pore liner having a pocket configuration is received over the frame and straps, and, likewise, an upholstery portion is slipped over the frame in the same fashion. A rigid seat pan accommodates a customized seat cushion and cooperates with an extendable leg rest (60) that is pivotally mounted to the front edge of the seat (10). Clothing guards are provided beneath arm rests (40), which in selected embodiments may also be selectively raised and lowered relative to the frame (14) as desired. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/00; A61G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/022 (2006.01); A47C 1/024 (2006.01); A47C 1/035 (2006.01); A47C 5/06 (2006.01); A47C 7/74 (2006.01); A47C 31/11 (2006.01); A61G 5/00 (2006.01); A61G 5/12 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/116 (2013.01); A47C 1/03216 (2013.01); A47C 1/035 (2013.01); A47C 7/742 (2013.01); A61G 5/006 (2013.01); A61G 5/1091 (2016.11); A61G 5/12 (2013.01); A61G 5/125 (2016.11); A61G 5/1043 (2013.01); A61G 2203/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908163 A2 19990414; EP 0908163 A3 20000405; CA 2239737 A1 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61G 5/00 A, 7A 61G 5/12 B

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI