Global Patent Index - EP 0908173 A3

EP 0908173 A3 2000-04-19 - Use in perfumery of 1-methoxy-2-methyl-3-phenylpropane,1-(2-methoxypropyl)-4-methylbenzene and 3-methoxy-2,2,3,-trimethyl-1-phenylbutane

Title (en)

Use in perfumery of 1-methoxy-2-methyl-3-phenylpropane,1-(2-methoxypropyl)-4-methylbenzene and 3-methoxy-2,2,3,-trimethyl-1-phenylbutane

Title (de)

Anwendung in der Parfümerie von 1-Methoxy-2-methyl-3-phenylpropan,1-(2-Methoxypropyl)-4-methylbenzol und 3-Methoxy-2,2,3,trimethyl-1-phenylbutan

Title (fr)

Utilisation en parfumerie du 1-méthoxy-2-méthyl-3-phénylpropane, du 1-(2-méthoxypropyl)-4-méthylbenzène et du 3-méthoxy-2,2,3-triméthyl-1-phénylbutane

Publication

EP 0908173 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98118176 A

Priority

CH 235597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908173A2] Use of 1-methoxy-2-methyl-3-phenylpropane, 1-(2-methoxypropyl)-4-methylbenzene or 3-methoxy-2,2,3-trimethyl-1-phenylbutane as perfume ingredients. 1-methoxy-2-methyl-3-phenylpropane (I), 1-(2-methoxypropyl)-4-methylbenzene (II) or 3-methoxy-2,2,3-trimethyl-1-phenylbutane (III) are used as perfume ingredients having a green fragrance with a strong pleasant flowery note. Independent claims are included covering (a) perfume compositions or perfumed articles containing (I), (II) and/or (III); (b) perfumed articles in the form of perfumes, toilet waters, soaps, bath or shower gel, shampoos, cosmetic preparations, deodorants, air fresheners, detergents, fabric softeners and maintenance products containing (I), (II) or (III); (c) detergents and chlorinated products containing (I), (II) or (III); (d) 1-(2-methoxypropyl)-4-methylbenzene and (e) 3-methoxy-2,2,3-trimethyl-1-phenylbutane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/46; C11B 9/00; C11D 3/395; C11D 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61Q 13/00 (2006.01); C07C 43/164 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3956 (2013.01); C11B 9/0061 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908173 A2 19990414; EP 0908173 A3 20000419; EP 0908173 B1 20040218; DE 69821700 D1 20040325; DE 69821700 T2 20041202; ES 2216225 T3 20041016; JP 3697086 B2 20050921; JP H11199890 A 19990727; US 5939368 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080925

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216225 T3

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821700 P 20040325

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/46 A, 7C 11B 9/00 B, 7C 11D 3/395 B, 7C 11D 3/50 B

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI