Global Patent Index - EP 0908200 B1

EP 0908200 B1 2002-11-27 - Golf club with compound shaft

Title (en)

Golf club with compound shaft

Title (de)

Golfschläger mit Verbundschaft

Title (fr)

Club de golf avec manche composite

Publication

EP 0908200 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98306901 A

Priority

  • US 93156997 A
  • US 1589098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908200A2] A golf club shaft (21) comprising an at least partially hollow outer shaft (22) having a butt end (2) and a head end (3), and an inner shaft (28) located within said outer shaft (22) and spaced radially therefrom, said shafts (22, 28) abutting one another at two locations (29, 30), the first location (29) being closer to said butt end (2) than the second, wherein the shafts (22, 28) are substantially securely fastened together at said first location (29) and are arranged at said second location (30) such that said outer shaft (22) can pivot about the inner shaft (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 53/10; A63B 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 53/10 (2006.01); A63B 53/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 53/10 (2013.01); A63B 60/00 (2015.10); A63B 60/06 (2015.10); A63B 60/08 (2015.10); A63B 60/10 (2015.10); A63B 60/54 (2015.10); A63B 2060/002 (2015.10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908200 A2 19990414; EP 0908200 A3 19991208; EP 0908200 B1 20021127; DE 69809678 D1 20030109; JP H11128421 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809678 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2000-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000215

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 63B 53/10 A, 6A 63B 53/00 B

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI