Global Patent Index - EP 0908208 B1

EP 0908208 B1 2001-03-21 - Detachable tip for a snow shoe and snow shoe with a tip

Title (en)

Detachable tip for a snow shoe and snow shoe with a tip

Title (de)

Abnehmbarer Spatel für einen Schneeschuh und Schneeschuh mit einem Spatel

Title (fr)

Couteau amovible pour raquette a neige et raquette equipee d'un couteau

Publication

EP 0908208 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98410113 A

Priority

  • FR 9712741 A
  • FR 9716598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908208A1] The knife (30) is fixed to a snow shoe by its upper surface which rests against the lower surface of the frame of the snow shoe. A central projection engages in a complementary hole in the frame. A locking bolt, pivoting on the projection, rests on the upper surface of the frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 13/003 (2013.01); A63C 13/005 (2013.01); A63C 13/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908208 A1 19990414; EP 0908208 B1 20010321; AT 199837 T 20010415; DE 69800618 D1 20010426; FR 2769242 A1 19990409; FR 2769242 B1 20000114; US 6026597 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2001-06-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-05-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TSL SPORT EQUIPMENT S.A.

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800618 20010426

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2001-03-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199837 T 20010415

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991004

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI