Global Patent Index - EP 0908271 A3

EP 0908271 A3 2001-01-31 - Lapping head with oscillating toolholders

Title (en)

Lapping head with oscillating toolholders

Title (de)

Schleifkopf mit oszillierenden Werkzeugträgern

Title (fr)

Tête de polissage avec supports d'outils oscillants

Publication

EP 0908271 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830162 A

Priority

IT FI970223 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908271A2] Lapping head with oscillating toolholders, with a driving shaft (1), and a plurality of toolholders (6) which are connected to the driving motor (1) by means of first and second drive means for the transmission of motion; wherein the first drive means (3, 5) comprise a first body (5) for supporting the toolholders (6) which is integral with the driving shaft (1) and the second drive means cause the toolholders (6) to oscillate about their axes (7), wherein the second drive means comprise at least a plurality of first gears (15) pivoted on said plurality of toolholders 6), and a crown gear (12) connected to the driving motor (1) and meshing with said plurality of first gears (15) through two toothings (14, 15') one of which exhibits at least a variation of inclination along its development, and wherein the said toolholders (6) are pivoted on said support body so as to oscillate when the meshing of said toothings takes place in correspondence of a portion thereof exhibiting said variation of inclination (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 41/047; B24B 47/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/0475 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908271 A2 19990414; EP 0908271 A3 20010131; EP 0908271 B1 20021023; BR 9801586 A 19990601; DE 69808869 D1 20021128; DE 69808869 T2 20030911; ES 2185138 T3 20030416; HK 1019213 A1 20020412; IT 1295664 B1 19990524; IT FI970223 A1 19990409; IT FI970223 D0 19971009; KR 100384374 B1 20030716; TW 431951 B 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2185138

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-01-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69808869

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-28

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020422

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT PT

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SIGNORINI, ROBERTO

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI